CA ACR13 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-18-1)
Status: Passed on September 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 133, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the Tomb of the Unknown Soldier.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tomb of the Unknown Soldier.

Sponsors

Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Kelly Seyarto [R]Sen. Bob Archuleta [D]Sen. Richard Roth [D]
Sen. Tom Umberg [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Akilah Weber [D]
Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]Asm. Steve Bennett [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]
Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]
Asm. Isaac Bryan [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Lisa Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]
Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]
Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]
Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]
Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]
Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]
Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]
Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [D]
Asm. Chad Mayes [I]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Megan Dahle [R]
Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Janet Nguyen [R]
Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]
Asm. James Ramos [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]
Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Thurston Smith [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]
Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Suzette Martinez Valladares [R]Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]
Asm. Chris Ward [D]

Roll Calls

2021-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR13 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - ACR 13 Seyarto Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-17 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 133, Statutes of 2021.
2021-09-17 Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m.
2021-09-07AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2021-09-07SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0.)
2021-09-07SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2021-09-01SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-23SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2021-08-19AssemblyAdopted and to Senate.
2021-08-19AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-07-15AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 15).
2021-02-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-01-22AssemblyFrom printer.
2021-01-21AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback