CA ACR129 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-20-1)
Status: Passed on September 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 212, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-20-1)
Status: Passed on September 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 212, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to civic engagement.
Title
Civic engagement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-15 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE ACR129 Cristina Garcia By Allen (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-28 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 212, Statutes of 2017. |
2017-09-28 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3003.) |
2017-09-15 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-14 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 3246.) |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 11). |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-08-29 | Assembly | From printer. |
2017-08-28 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |