CA ACR126 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-7)
Status: Passed on September 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 204, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to National Latina Equal Pay Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

National Latina Equal Pay Day.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR126 Gonzalez Fletcher By Lara (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-25AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 204, Statutes of 2017.
2017-09-25AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
2017-09-15AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2017-09-14SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2935.)
2017-09-11SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-08SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2017-09-07AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 3029.)
2017-09-07AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-09-01AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (September 1).
2017-08-24AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-08-23AssemblyFrom printer.
2017-08-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback