CA ACR121 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-21)
Status: Passed on September 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 170, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to California Hindu American Awareness and Appreciation Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Hindu American Awareness and Appreciation Month.

Sponsors

Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]
Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Bob Wieckowski [D]Asm. Dante Acosta [R]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]
Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Catharine Baker [R]Sen. Jim Beall [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]
Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Raul Bocanegra [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]
Asm. William Brough [R]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Anna Caballero [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]
Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Rocky Chavez [R]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]
Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]
Asm. Brian Dahle [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Vince Fong [R]
Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]
Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]
Asm. Matthew Harper [R]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]
Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]
Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]
Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]
Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]Sen. Richard Pan [D]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]
Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]
Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Marc Steinorth [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]
Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]
Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2017-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR121 Kalra et al. By Wieckowski (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-28 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-21AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 170, Statutes of 2017.
2017-09-21AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
2017-09-13AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2017-09-12SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2762.)
2017-09-06SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-01SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2017-08-31AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 2833.)
2017-08-31AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-08-28AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 28).
2017-08-24AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-08-24AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-08-22AssemblyFrom printer.
2017-08-21AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback