CA ACR117 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 63, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 63, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the California Highway Patrol Officer Brett J. Oswald Memorial Interchange.
Title
The California Highway Patrol Officer Brett J. Oswald
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-25 - Assembly - ACR 117 ACHADJIAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd ACR117 Achadjian (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Assembly - ACR 117 ACHADJIAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - Assembly - Be adopted and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd ACR117 Achadjian (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Assembly - ACR 117 ACHADJIAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - Assembly - Be adopted and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 63, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-06-29 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |
2012-06-25 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5417.). | |
2012-06-21 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | |
2012-06-21 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4027.) | |
2012-06-18 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-06-15 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-06-13 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-05-31 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2012-05-17 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2012-05-03 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |
2012-05-03 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 4660.) | |
2012-04-18 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (April 18). | |
2012-04-10 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-09 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2012-03-29 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended. | |
2012-03-15 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |