CA ACR113 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-21-1)
Status: Passed on June 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 61, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-21-1)
Status: Passed on June 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 61, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Lunar New Year celebration.
Title
Lunar New Year Celebration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-02 - Senate - Special Consent # ACR113 Low By Liu (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-08 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 61, Statutes of 2016. |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4150.) |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2016-02-08 | Assembly | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 3586.) |
2016-01-21 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 21). |
2016-01-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-01-12 | Assembly | From printer. |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |