CA ACR112 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-23)
Status: Passed on September 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 201, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Korean American veterans of the Vietnam conflict.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Korean American veterans of the Vietnam conflict.

Sponsors

Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Dante Acosta [R]
Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Juan Arambula [D]Asm. Catharine Baker [R]Asm. Marc Berman [D]
Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Raul Bocanegra [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. William Brough [R]
Asm. Anna Caballero [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]
Asm. Rocky Chavez [R]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]
Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Matt Dababneh [D]
Asm. Brian Dahle [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Vince Fong [R]
Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]
Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]
Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Matthew Harper [R]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]
Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]
Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]
Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]
Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]
Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]
Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]
Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Marc Steinorth [R]Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]
Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2017-09-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR112 Choi et al. By Nguyen (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-22 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-25AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 201, Statutes of 2017.
2017-09-25AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
2017-09-15AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2017-09-14SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2932.)
2017-09-07SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-06SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2017-09-05AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 2946.)
2017-09-05AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-08-24AssemblyAmended. Ordered to third reading.
2017-08-23AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 22).
2017-07-21AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-07-20AssemblyReferred to Com. on V.A.
2017-07-13AssemblyFrom printer.
2017-07-12AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback