CA ACR111 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-21)
Status: Passed on July 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 119, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to India’s Independence Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

India’s Independence Day.

Sponsors

Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Bob Wieckowski [D]Asm. Dante Acosta [R]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]
Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]
Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. William Brough [R]Asm. Anna Caballero [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]
Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Rocky Chavez [R]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]
Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]
Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Matt Dababneh [D]Asm. Brian Dahle [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]
Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]
Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Matthew Harper [R]Asm. Chris Holden [D]
Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]
Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]
Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]Sen. Tony Mendoza [D]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]
Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]
Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]
Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]
Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Marc Steinorth [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]
Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2017-07-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR111 Kalra et al. By Wieckowski (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-13 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-31AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 119, Statutes of 2017.
2017-07-31AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m.
2017-07-20AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2017-07-20SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2121.)
2017-07-19SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2017-07-18SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2017-07-17AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 2574.)
2017-07-17AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-07-13AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 13).
2017-07-10AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-07-07AssemblyFrom printer.
2017-07-06AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback