CA ACR111 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-21)
Status: Passed on April 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 11, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-21)
Status: Passed on April 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 11, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Purple Heart State.
Title
Purple Heart State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-12 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE ACR111 Cook (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 11, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-04-20 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:40 p.m. | |
2012-04-12 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2012-04-12 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3130.) | |
2012-03-20 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |
2012-03-19 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4035.) | |
2012-03-15 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 15). | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-02-22 | From printer. | |
2012-02-21 | Introduced. To print. |