CA ACR110 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-17)
Status: Passed on June 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 55, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-17)
Status: Passed on June 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 55, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Health Care District Month.
Title
Health Care District Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-05 - Senate - Special Consent #16 ACR110 Fox (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-10 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 55, Statutes of 2014. |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. |
2014-06-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3757.) |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-12 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4830.) |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 2). |
2014-03-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |