CA ACR110 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on September 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 110, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on September 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 110, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to California Mental Health No Stigma Week.
Title
California Mental Health No Stigma Week.
Sponsors
Asm. K H Achadjian [R] | Sen. Marty Block [D] | Sen. Lou Correa [D] | Sen. Noreen Evans [D] |
Asm. Nathan Fletcher [R] | Sen. Jean Fuller [R] | Asm. Fiona Ma [D] | Sen. Darrell Steinberg [D] |
Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-08-22 - Assembly - ACR 110 FLETCHER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE ACR110 Fletcher (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Assembly - ACR 110 FLETCHER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE ACR110 Fletcher (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Assembly - ACR 110 FLETCHER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 110, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-04 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:30 p.m. | |
2012-08-22 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6090.). | |
2012-05-10 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | |
2012-05-10 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3473.) | |
2012-05-01 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-03-15 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |
2012-03-15 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 3996.) | |
2012-03-08 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 8). | |
2012-02-23 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-02-15 | From printer. | |
2012-02-14 | Introduced. To print. |