CA ACR11 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-14)
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 6, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Physician Anesthesiologist Week.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Physician Anesthesiologist Week.

Sponsors

Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]
Asm. Steve Bennett [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]
Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Lisa Calderon [D]
Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. David Chiu [D]
Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]
Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Laurie Davies [R]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]
Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]
Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]
Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Sen. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]
Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Alex Lee [D]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]
Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]
Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]
Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Janet Nguyen [R]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]
Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. James Ramos [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]
Asm. Robert Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]
Asm. Kelly Seyarto [R]Asm. Thurston Smith [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]
Asm. Suzette Martinez Valladares [R]Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D]Asm. Chris Ward [D]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]
Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2021-03-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR11 Flora et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Assembly - ACR 11 Flora Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 6, Statutes of 2021.
2021-04-07 Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
2021-03-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2021-03-01SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0.)
2021-03-01SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2021-02-17SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2021-02-08SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2021-02-04AssemblyAdopted and to Senate.
2021-02-04AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-01-28AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 28).
2021-01-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-01-22AssemblyFrom printer.
2021-01-21AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback