CA ACR11 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-22)
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 10, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-22)
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 10, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to a Day of Remembrance.
Title
Day of Remembrance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-28 - Senate - Special Consent Cal ACR11 Muratsuchi (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 10, Statutes of 2013. |
2013-03-13 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. |
2013-02-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 228.) |
2013-02-27 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-19 | Assembly | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 326.) |
2013-02-15 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (February 15). |
2013-02-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. |
2013-02-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-01 | Assembly | From printer. |
2013-01-31 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |