CA ACR102 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-24)
Status: Passed on September 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 141, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Opportunity Youth Reengagement Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Opportunity Youth Reengagement Month.

Sponsors

Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Dante Acosta [R]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Travis Allen [R]
Sen. Benjamin Allen [D]Asm. Catharine Baker [R]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]
Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Sen. Steven Bradford [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]
Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Rocky Chavez [R]
Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]
Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Brian Dahle [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]
Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]
Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]
Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]
Asm. Matthew Harper [R]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]
Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]
Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]
Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]
Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]
Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]Sen. Richard Pan [D]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]
Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]
Asm. Sebastian Ridley-Thomas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]
Asm. Marc Steinorth [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]
Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2017-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR102 Eduardo Garcia et al. By Hueso (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-07AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 141, Statutes of 2017.
2017-09-07AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m.
2017-08-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2017-08-31SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2344.)
2017-08-23SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2017-08-22SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2017-08-21AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 2686.)
2017-08-21AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-07-13AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 12).
2017-06-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2017-06-14AssemblyFrom printer.
2017-06-13AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback