CA ACR101 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session


Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-27)
Status: Passed on September 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 191, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]


Relative to Coastal Cleanup Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Coastal Cleanup Day.


Asm. William Brough [R]Asm. K H Achadjian [R]Asm. Luis Alejo [D]Asm. Travis Allen [R]
Asm. Toni Atkins [D]Asm. Catharine Baker [R]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]
Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. Cheryl Brown [D]Asm. Nora Campos [D]Asm. Ling-ling Chang [R]
Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Rocky Chavez [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]
Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Matt Dababneh [D]Asm. Brian Dahle [R]
Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Bill Dodd [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Beth Gaines [R]
Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Mike Gatto [D]
Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Jimmy Gomez [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez [D]Asm. Richard Gordon [D]
Asm. Shannon Grove [R]Asm. David Hadley [R]Asm. Matthew Harper [R]Asm. Roger Hernandez [D]
Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Brian Jones [R]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]
Asm. Young Kim [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Eric Linder [R]
Asm. Patty Lopez [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]
Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]
Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]Asm. Kristin Olsen [R]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]
Asm. Henry Perea [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]
Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Marc Steinorth [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]
Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Donald Wagner [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]
Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Scott Wilk [R]Asm. Das Williams [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2015-09-08 - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR101 Brough By Hill (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-24 - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]


2015-09-21AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 191, Statutes of 2015.
2015-09-21AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m.
2015-09-08AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2015-09-08SenateAdopted and to Assembly.
2015-09-01SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2015-08-31SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2015-08-27AssemblyAmended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 2618.)
2015-08-24AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 24).
2015-08-20AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2015-08-18AssemblyFrom printer.
2015-08-17AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources

Bill Comments