CA ACR100 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-15-1)
Status: Engrossed on August 26 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-08-30 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Child Support Awareness Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Support Awareness Month.

Sponsors

Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Akilah Weber [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]
Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]
Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Asm. Isaac Bryan [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Lisa Calderon [D]
Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]
Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]
Asm. Laurie Davies [R]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]
Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]
Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]
Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]
Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [D]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]
Asm. Chad Mayes [I]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Megan Dahle [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]
Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]
Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. James Ramos [D]
Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]
Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Kelly Seyarto [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]
Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Suzette Martinez Valladares [R]Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]
Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Chris Ward [D]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2021-08-26 - Assembly - ACR 100 Carrillo Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-30SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2021-08-26AssemblyAdopted and to Senate.
2021-08-26AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-08-19AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 19).
2021-08-19AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-08-17AssemblyFrom printer.
2021-08-16AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback