CA ACR100 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-24-1)
Status: Passed on August 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 116, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-24-1)
Status: Passed on August 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 116, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Kevin Woyjeck Memorial Highway.
Title
Kevin Woyjeck Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd ACR100 Travis Allen (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - Assembly - ACR 100 ALLEN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - Assembly - ACR 100 ALLEN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-16 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 116, Statutes of 2016. |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4875.) |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2016-05-03 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2016-05-02 | Assembly | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4619.) |
2016-01-25 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-01-21 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 21). |
2015-09-11 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3169.) From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-08-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2015-08-18 | Assembly | From printer. |
2015-08-17 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |