CA ACR10 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-18)
Status: Passed on February 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 3, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the Reverend Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr. Day.

Sponsors

Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]
Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Sen. Steven Bradford [D]
Asm. William Brough [R]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]
Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]
Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]
Asm. Brian Dahle [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Tyler Diep [R]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]
Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]
Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]
Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]
Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]
Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Monique Limon [D]
Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]
Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]Sen. Holly Mitchell [D]
Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]
Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. James Ramos [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]
Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]
Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Christy Smith [D]
Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]
Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2019-02-04 - Senate - Special Consent ACR10 Weber et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-11AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 3, Statutes of 2019.
2019-02-11AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m.
2019-02-04AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2019-02-04SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 136.)
2019-01-31SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-01-30SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2019-01-22SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2019-01-18AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 196.)
2019-01-18AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-01-15AssemblyIntroduced measure version corrected.
2019-01-10AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 10).
2019-01-10AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-01-10AssemblyFrom printer.
2019-01-09AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback