CA ACA9 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-14 - Referred to Com. on E. & R.
Pending: Assembly Elections and Redistricting Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-14 - Referred to Com. on E. & R.
Pending: Assembly Elections and Redistricting Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Sections 8 and 10 of Article II thereof, relating to initiatives.
Title
Initiative measures: supermajority requirement.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gatto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | |
2011-01-03 | Read first time. | |
2010-12-10 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 9. | |
2010-12-09 | Introduced. To print. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=aca_9&sess=1112&house=A |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/aca_9_bill_20101209_introduced.html |