CA ACA7 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Section 2 of Article II thereof, relating to elections.
Title
Voting age: school and community college district governing board elections.
Sponsors
Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Nora Campos [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] |
Asm. Kevin McCarty [D] | Asm. Jose Medina [D] | Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] | Asm. Tony Thurmond [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2016-02-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. |
2016-02-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=aca_7&sess=1516&house=A |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/aca_7_bill_20160211_introduced.html |