CA ACA6 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-07-14 - Read. Refused adoption. (Ayes 50. Noes 23. Page 2329.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-07-14 - Read. Refused adoption. (Ayes 50. Noes 23. Page 2329.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Section 8 of Article II thereof, relating to initiatives.
Title
Initiative measures: funding source.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-07-14 - Assembly - ACA6 GATTO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2011-07-11 - Assembly - ACA6 GATTO Assembly Third Reading Amend By GATTO Set #1 (Y: 52 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-07-01 - Assembly - ACA6 GATTO Assembly Third Reading Amend By OLSEN Set #1 (Y: 43 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-11 - Assembly - ACA6 GATTO Assembly Third Reading Amend By GATTO Set #1 (Y: 52 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-07-01 - Assembly - ACA6 GATTO Assembly Third Reading Amend By OLSEN Set #1 (Y: 43 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-14 | Read. Refused adoption. (Ayes 50. Noes 23. Page 2329.) | |
2011-07-11 | Assembly Rule 69(b) suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 2259.) Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 52. Noes 17. Page 2260.) | |
2011-07-01 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 43. Noes 15. Page 2158.) | |
2011-05-27 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-23 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-19 | Read second time and amended. | |
2011-05-18 | From committee: Be adopted as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 17). | |
2011-05-11 | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. | |
2011-05-10 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-04-25 | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. | |
2011-04-14 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-12-07 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 6. | |
2010-12-06 | Read first time. To print. |