CA ACA5 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 30, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 30, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Section 1 of Article XIX A thereof, by adding Section 15 to Article XIII B thereof, and by adding Article XIX D thereto, relating to transportation.
Title
Motor vehicle fees and taxes: restriction on expenditures: appropriations limit.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Frazier [D] | Sen. Josh Newman [D] | Asm. Todd Gloria [D] | Asm. Evan Low [D] |
Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] | Asm. Miguel Santiago [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - Assembly - ACA 5 FRAZIER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Assembly - ACA 5 FRAZIER Assembly Third Reading Amend By HARPER Set #1 Motion to Lay on the Table By CALDERON (Y: 54 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading (Supplemental File 1) ACA5 Frazier et al. By Newman (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Assembly - ACA 5 FRAZIER Assembly Third Reading Amend By HARPER Set #1 Motion to Lay on the Table By CALDERON (Y: 54 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading (Supplemental File 1) ACA5 Frazier et al. By Newman (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-17 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 30, Statutes of 2017. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1 p.m. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read third time. Adopted. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 654.) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 653.) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Joint Rules suspended. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read first time. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Adopted. (Ayes 56. Noes 24. Page 969.) |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 968.) |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | Joint Rules suspended. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |