CA ACA4 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Section 4 of Article XIII A thereof, and by amending Section 2 of Article XIII C thereof, relating to taxation.
Title
Local government transportation projects: special taxes: voter approval.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Frazier [D] | Sen. Lois Wolk [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-07-13 - Assembly - Be adopted and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Assembly - Be adopted and be re-referred to the Committee on Revenue and Taxation (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Assembly - Be adopted and be re-referred to the Committee on Revenue and Taxation (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2015-08-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-08-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2015-07-14 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS., REV. & TAX. and APPR. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |