CA ACA4 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on October 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 174, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on October 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 174, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Section 12 of Article IV thereof, and by amending Section 20 of, and adding Section 21 to, Article XVI thereof, relating to state finance.
Title
State finance.
Sponsors
Sen. Roy Ashburn [R] | Asm. Karen Bass [D] | Asm. Mike Feuer [D] | Asm. Mike Gatto [D] |
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] | Sen. Roger Niello [R] | Asm. John Perez [D] | Sen. Darrell Steinberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-10-08 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE ACA4 Gatto and Niello (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-10-07 - Assembly - ACA4 GATTO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-10-07 - Assembly - ACA4 GATTO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 174, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-10-13 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:50 p.m. | |
2010-10-08 | In Assembly. To enrollment. (Corrected October 12.) | |
2010-10-08 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 5251.) | |
2010-10-07 | In Senate. Read first time. Art. IV, Sec. 8(b) of the Constitution suspended. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5243.) Read second time. To third reading. Read third time. | |
2010-10-07 | Assembly Rule 96(b) suspended. (Page 7117.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on third reading file. Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 7117.). Read third time, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 8. Page 7117.) | |
2010-05-24 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2010-05-11 | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |
2010-05-10 | In committee: Hearing for testimony only. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. (Corrected May 24.) | |
2010-04-29 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2010-04-15 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Further hearing to be set. | |
2010-04-13 | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |
2010-04-12 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-03-22 | Re-referred to Com. on RULES by unanimous consent. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (March 22). | |
2010-03-18 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-03-17 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-20 | Referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2008-12-08 | Read first time. | |
2008-12-04 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. | |
2008-12-03 | Introduced. To print. |