CA ACA3 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-03 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Elections and Redistricting Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-03 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Elections and Redistricting Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Sections 9 and 10 of, and adding Section 7.5 to, Article II thereof, and by amending Section 8 of Article IV thereof, relating to elections.
Title
Elections: initiatives and referenda.
Sponsors
Asm. Kevin Kiley [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2017-01-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 19. |
2017-01-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |