CA ACA3 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending and adding subdivision (h) of Section 17 of Article XVI thereof, relating to public employees' retirement.
Title
Public employees' retirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-24 - Assembly - Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Assembly - Be adopted and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-06-24 - Assembly - Be adopted and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |