CA ACA2 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-16 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-16 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by adding Section 8.7 to Article XVI thereof, relating to education finance.
Title
Education finance: payment of state apportionments.
Sponsors
Asm. Brian Nestande [R] | Asm. Kristin Olsen [R] | Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R] | Asm. Diane Harkey [R] |
Asm. Brian Maienschein [D] | Asm. Donald Wagner [R] | Sen. Scott Wilk [R] | Sen. Anthony Cannella [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-16 | Assembly | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2014-01-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-08-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-08-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-08-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2013-06-26 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-04 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ED. and APPR. |
2013-01-07 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2012-12-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 18. |
2012-12-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |