CA ACA16 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on June 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-27 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
Pending: Assembly Elections and Redistricting Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-27 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
Pending: Assembly Elections and Redistricting Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Section 2 of Article XXI thereof, relating to redistricting.
Title
Redistricting: Senate districts.
Sponsors
Asm. James Gallagher [R] | Sen. Brian Dahle [R] | Sen. Joel Anderson [R] | Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R] |
Asm. Heath Flora [R] | Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] | Asm. Marc Steinorth [R] |
Sen. Jeff Stone [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 1 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E. & R. and APPR. |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee July 8. |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |