CA ACA14 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-24 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Further hearing to be set.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-24 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Further hearing to be set.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Section 8 of Article II thereof, relating to the initiative.
Title
Initiative measures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-24 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Further hearing to be set. | |
2009-04-20 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To print. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=aca_14&sess=0910&house=A |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/aca_14_bill_20090227_introduced.html |