CA ACA12 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Section 2 of Article XIII A thereof, relating to taxation.
Title
Property taxation: base year value transfers: persons with a severely disabled child.
Sponsors
Asm. Todd Gloria [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-25 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Be adopted as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-24 - Assembly - ACA 12 GLORIA Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Be adopted as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-24 - Assembly - ACA 12 GLORIA Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended, and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 11). |
2017-08-30 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E. & C.A. |
2017-08-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2767.) |
2017-07-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-07-19 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 19). |
2017-07-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2017-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 8). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-03-31 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 30. |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |