CA ACA11 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-08-22 - Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
Pending: Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by adding Article XXXIVĂ‚ A thereto, relating to housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Middle Class Affordable Housing and Homeless Shelter: funding.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2017-08-21AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
2017-07-03AssemblyReferred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and REV. & TAX.
2017-03-21AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee April 20.
2017-03-20AssemblyRead first time. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback