CA ACA1 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 105, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 105, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by adding Section 24 to Article XX thereof, relating to climate change.
Title
Greenhouse Gas Reduction Reserve Fund.
Sponsors
Asm. Chad Mayes [I] |
Roll Calls
2017-07-17 - Assembly - ACA 1 MAYES Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 59 N: 11 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACA1 Mayes By Roth (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - ACA 1 MULLIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Be adopted (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACA1 Mayes By Roth (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - ACA 1 MULLIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Be adopted (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-18 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 105, Statutes of 2017. |
2017-07-18 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 12:30 p.m. |
2017-07-17 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 11. Page 2587.). |
2017-07-17 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 19. Page 2585.) |
2017-07-17 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. |
2017-07-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-07-17 | Senate | Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-07-17 | Senate | Read third time. Adopted. (Ayes 27. Noes 13. Page 2078.) |
2017-07-17 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-17 | Senate | (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 2067.) |
2017-07-17 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-07-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-13 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Measure version as amended on June 21 corrected. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and APPR. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1969.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26). |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E. & R. and APPR. |
2016-12-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 5. |
2016-12-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |