CA AB997 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 788, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 788, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 25607 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.
Title
Alcoholic beverage licensees: winegrowers and beer manufacturers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-05 - Assembly - AB 997 AGUIAR-CURRY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB997 Aguiar-Curry By Berryhill (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 997 AGUIAR-CURRY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB997 Aguiar-Curry By Berryhill (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 997 AGUIAR-CURRY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 788, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2926.). |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2330.). |
2017-07-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 13). |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1393.) |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26). |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (March 29). |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 25607 | Amended Code | Citation Text |