CA AB992 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-31 - Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 54952.2 of the Government Code, relating to local government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Open meetings: local agencies: social media.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Assembly - AB 992 Mullin Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 13 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Reconsideration (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-31SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2020-07-30SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 29).
2020-06-23SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2020-01-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-01-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 13. Page 3938.)
2020-01-16AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-01-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (January 15).
2019-05-01AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
2019-04-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2019-04-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. GOV.
2019-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
2019-02-21AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code54952.2Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback