CA AB992 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 40, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 40, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 31760 of the Government Code, relating to county employees' retirement.
Title
County Employees Retirement Law of 1937: disability retirement: modification of allowance.
Sponsors
Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Ken Cooley [D] | Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D] | Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D] |
Asm. Anthony Rendon [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB992 Committee on Public Em ployees, Retirement, (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - AB 992 P.E., R.& S.S. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - AB 992 P.E., R.& S.S. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 40, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-07-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-06-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1490.). |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 8). |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1447.) |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 6). |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 31760 | Amended Code | Citation Text |