CA AB992 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3346 of the Civil Code, to amend Section 733 of the Code of Civil Procedure, to amend Section 13007 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 4435 of the Public Resources Code, relating to civil liability.
Title
Civil liability: wildfires.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-28 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2011-05-03 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-04-28 | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-04-14 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | |
2011-04-13 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |
2011-04-12 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-04-04 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |
2011-03-31 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 733 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 3346 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 13007 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4435 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4581 | Amended Code | Citation Text |