CA AB990 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 747, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 747, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 84506.5, 84507, and 84511 of the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Political Reform Act of 1974: advertisement disclosures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-10 - Assembly - AB 990 BONILLA Concurrence- Urgency Added (Y: 66 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-09-09 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB990 Bonilla By Allen (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - AB 990 BONILLA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-09 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB990 Bonilla By Allen (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - AB 990 BONILLA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 747, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-18 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-10 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 66. Noes 10. Page 3049.). |
2015-09-09 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (September 9). |
2015-09-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2015-09-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-09-02 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 8. Page 2390.). |
2015-08-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-24 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-08-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-08-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (August 18). |
2015-07-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2015-07-07 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1449.) |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 6). |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 84506.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 84507 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 84511 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 138.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |