CA AB99 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 16.8 (commencing with Section 13178) to Chapter 2 of Division 7 of the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to pesticides.
Title
Department of Transportation: state roads and highways: integrated pest management.
Sponsors
Asm. Damon Connolly [D] | Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D] | Asm. Corey Jackson [D] | Asm. Ash Kalra [D] |
Sen. Mike McGuire [D] | Asm. Philip Ting [D] | Asm. Akilah Weber [D] | Asm. Lori Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-08-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Assembly - AB 99 Connolly Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Assembly - AB 99 Connolly Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-01 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2023-08-14 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2023-07-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 12). |
2023-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and E.Q. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 16. Page 1706.) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 18). |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1580.) |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2023-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2023-03-03 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-03-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-03-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2023-02-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-01-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2023-01-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 13178 | New Code | See Bill Text |