CA AB989 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 17072 of, to amend and repeal Sections 17131.4, 17131.5, 17215.1, and 17215.4 of, and to add Section 17217 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Income tax: health savings accounts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 3). |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17072 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17131.4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17131.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17215.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17215.4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17217 | New Code | See Bill Text |