CA AB989 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 459, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 459, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 22309, 22661, 22662, 22663, 22801, 23104, 23203, 24615, and 26214 of, and to add Section 22337 to, the Education Code, relating to state teachers' retirement.
Title
State teachers' retirement: account statements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-08-30 - Assembly - AB 989 MULLIN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB989 Mullin By Gaines (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Assembly - AB 989 MULLIN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB989 Mullin By Gaines (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Assembly - AB 989 MULLIN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 459, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2013-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2764.). |
2013-08-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2013-08-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1878.). |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2013-06-17 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1118.) |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 17). |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 22309 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 22337 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 22661 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 22662 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 22663 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 22801 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 23104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 23203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 24615 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 26214 | Amended Code | Citation Text |