CA AB987 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2104, 8385, and 8386 of, and to add Sections 2105.5, 2106.5, 2774.2, 2774.3, and 8386.7 to, the Public Utilities Code, relating to public utilities.
Title
Public utilities: civil penalties: unplanned electrical outages and deenergization events.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 2104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2105.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2106.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2774.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2774.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 8385 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 8386 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 8386.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |