CA AB984 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 169, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 169, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend and repeal Section 128.5 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to courts, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Courts: frivolous actions or tactics.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-20 - Assembly - AB 984 CALDERON Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB984 Calderon By Hertzberg Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Assembly - AB 984 CALDERON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB984 Calderon By Hertzberg Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Assembly - AB 984 CALDERON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 169, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-08-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-07-31 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2017-07-20 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 2638.). |
2017-07-20 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 22. Page 2636.) |
2017-07-20 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. |
2017-07-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2120.). |
2017-07-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-17 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2017-06-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 1542.) |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 10). |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 128.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |