CA AB983 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 515, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 515, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 116760.20, 116760.70, and 116761.23 of, and to add Section 116760.39 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Safe Drinking Water State Revolving Fund.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Eng [D] | Asm. Paul Fong [D] | Sen. Tony Mendoza [D] | Asm. Henry Perea [D] |
Asm. Manuel Perez [D] | Asm. Jose Solorio [D] | Sen. Lois Wolk [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-09-09 - Assembly - AB 983 PEREA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB983 Perea By Simitian (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB983 Perea By Simitian (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Assembly - AB 983 PEREA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB983 Perea By Simitian (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB983 Perea By Simitian (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Assembly - AB 983 PEREA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 515, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-23 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2011-09-09 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3205.). | |
2011-09-09 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. (Page 2446.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2447.). | |
2011-09-08 | In Senate. Held at Desk. Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2419.) Ordered to third reading. Pursuant to Joint Rule 33.1, Joint Rule 61(a)(13) suspended. (Page 2428.) Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-09-08 | Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-09-07 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | |
2011-09-07 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2337.). | |
2011-09-06 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-09-02 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-08-29 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-25 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 25). | |
2011-07-11 | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-07-01 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-20 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-08 | Referred to Com. on E.Q. | |
2011-06-01 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-06-01 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1706.) | |
2011-05-27 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-18 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-05-09 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-05 | Read second time and amended. | |
2011-05-04 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 26). | |
2011-04-04 | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | |
2011-03-31 | Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and W., P. & W. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |