CA AB981 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 484, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 484, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 44559.1, 44559.3, and 44559.4 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to the Capital Access Loan Program.
Title
California Pollution Control Financing Authority:
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-08 - Assembly - AB 981 HUESO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB981 Hueso By De León (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Assembly - AB 981 HUESO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB981 Hueso By De León (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Assembly - AB 981 HUESO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 484, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-22 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m. | |
2011-09-08 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 3082.). | |
2011-09-07 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | |
2011-09-07 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2363.). | |
2011-09-06 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-09-02 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-08-22 | From Special Consent Calendar pursuant to Joint Rule 22.2. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-17 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |
2011-08-16 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-15 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2011-07-05 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-06-22 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-06-14 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-02 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2011-05-26 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-26 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1567.) | |
2011-05-19 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-05-18 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 18). | |
2011-05-05 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-28 | Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | |
2011-04-26 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Com. on B. & F. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 44559.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 44559.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 44559.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |