CA AB978 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 6319.3 and 6401.7 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Employment safety: injury and illness prevention program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-11 - Assembly - AB 978 LIMÓN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 46 N: 28 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB978 L (Y: 3 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB978 Limón By Jackson (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 978 LIMÓN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 26 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - AB 978 LIMÓN Assembly Third Reading Amend By LIMÓN Set #1 (Y: 49 N: 23 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB978 L (Y: 3 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB978 Limón By Jackson (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 978 LIMÓN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 26 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - AB 978 LIMÓN Assembly Third Reading Amend By LIMÓN Set #1 (Y: 49 N: 23 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-12 | Stricken from file. | |
2018-01-03 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2017-10-14 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2017-09-19 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 46. Noes 28. Page 3124.). |
2017-09-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 2504.). |
2017-08-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-28 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-07-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 26. Page 1885.) |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 49. Noes 23. Page 1706.) |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (April 26). |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 6319.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 6401.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |