CA AB978 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 139, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 139, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 337 to the Financial Code, relating to financial institutions.
Title
Financial institutions: Iran sanctions.
Sponsors
Asm. Robert Blumenfield [D] | Asm. Cheryl Brown [D] | Asm. Steve Fox [D] | Asm. Jose Medina [D] |
Sen. Lou Correa [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-08-08 - Assembly - AB 978 Concurrence in Senate Amendments By FOX (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-07-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB978 Blumenfield By Correa (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Assembly - AB 978 BLUMENFIELD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Banking and Finance (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-07-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB978 Blumenfield By Correa (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Assembly - AB 978 BLUMENFIELD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Banking and Finance (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 139, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-08-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-08-15 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m. |
2013-08-08 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 2470.). |
2013-08-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1689.). |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2013-06-10 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 5). |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 1463.) |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 8). |
2013-04-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 22). |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2013-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 9). |
2013-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on J., E.D., & E. and B. & F. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Financial Code | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Financial Code | 337 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Financial Code | 465 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Financial Code | 500 | Amended Code | Citation Text |