CA AB976 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 17239 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Personal income tax: deductions: qualified pet adoption costs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-07-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Assembly - AB 976 STEINORTH Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-11-30SenateFrom Senate committee without further action.
2015-08-27SenateIn committee: Held under submission.
2015-07-06SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2015-06-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-06-11SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2015-06-02SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2015-06-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 8. Page 1764.)
2015-05-28AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-05-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (May 27).
2015-05-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (May 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-05-11AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2015-05-07AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
2015-04-27AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2015-04-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2015-04-16AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
2015-04-13AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2015-03-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2015-02-27AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
2015-02-26AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code17239Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_976&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_976_bill_20150226_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_976_bill_20150416_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_976_bill_20150507_amended_asm_v97.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_976_vote_20150518_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_976_vote_20150527_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_976_vote_20150602_1107AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_976_vote_20150624_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_976_vote_20150706_000001_sen_comm.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback