CA AB976 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-10 - Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 48. Noes 23. Page 3062.) Assembly refused to concur in Senate amendments. To Conference Committee. (Ayes 34. Noes 30. Page 3147.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 30821 of the Public Resources Code, relating to coastal resources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coastal resources: California Coastal Act of 1976: enforcement: penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-09-10 - Assembly - AB 976 ATKINS Motion to Reconsider (Y: 48 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-09-10 - Assembly - AB 976 ATKINS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 34 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2013-09-09 - Assembly - AB 976 ATKINS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 36 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2013-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB976 Atkins By De Le (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB976 Atkins Lay on Table (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB976 Atkins Lay on Table (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB976 Atkins Lay on Table (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB976 Atkins Lay on Table (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Assembly - AB 976 ATKINS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-09-10AssemblyReconsideration granted. (Ayes 48. Noes 23. Page 3062.) Assembly refused to concur in Senate amendments. To Conference Committee. (Ayes 34. Noes 30. Page 3147.)
2013-09-09AssemblyAssembly refused to concur in Senate amendments. (Ayes 36. Noes 32. Page 3044.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Atkins.
2013-09-06AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2013-09-06SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 17. Page 2190.).
2013-08-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-08-26SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2013-08-14SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2013-08-13SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
2013-07-08SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-07-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 2).
2013-06-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2013-06-13SenateReferred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and JUD.
2013-06-03SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2013-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 42. Noes 32. Page 1819.)
2013-05-28AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1653.)
2013-05-14AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-05-13AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2013-05-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 8).
2013-04-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-04-08AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2013-04-04AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2013-04-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 1).
2013-03-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2013-03-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2013-03-07AssemblyReferred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD.
2013-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2013-02-24AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
2013-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code30821New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code30823Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_976&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_976_bill_20130222_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_976_bill_20130319_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_976_bill_20130404_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_976_bill_20130513_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_976_bill_20130528_amended_asm_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_976_bill_20130708_amended_sen_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_976_bill_20130814_amended_sen_v93.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_976_bill_20130826_amended_sen_v92.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_976_vote_20130401_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_976_vote_20130416_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_976_vote_20130508_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_976_vote_20130530_0241PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_976_vote_20130625_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_976_vote_20130702_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_976_vote_20130906_0225PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_976_vote_20130906_0228PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_976_vote_20130906_0233PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_976_vote_20130906_0235PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_976_vote_20130906_0342PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_976_vote_20130909_0420PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_976_vote_20130910_0350PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_976_vote_20130910_1028AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback