CA AB976 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-27 - Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 366.3 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to public contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public contracts: consulting services: community choice

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-08-27 - Assembly - AB 976 HALL Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 64 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB976 Hall By Padilla (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-15 - Senate - Set, final hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-15 - Senate - Reconsideration granted (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-31 - Assembly - AB 976 HALL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-09-27 Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2012-09-27 Vetoed by Governor.
2012-09-05 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
2012-08-27 Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 9. Page 6296.).
2012-08-22 In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2012-08-22 Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 4692.).
2012-08-06 Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2012-07-06 From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 2).
2012-06-25 Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2012-06-21 From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 11).
2012-05-15 In committee: Set final hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
2011-07-05 In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2011-06-21 In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2011-06-08 Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
2011-05-31 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2011-05-31 Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 9. Page 1635.)
2011-05-19 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2011-05-18 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 18).
2011-05-05 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (May 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2011-04-25 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
2011-03-10 Referred to Com. on U. & C.
2011-02-20 From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2011-02-18 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code1090.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code366.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code366.3New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_976&sess=1112&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_976_bill_20110218_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_976_bill_20110425_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_976_bill_20120625_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_976_bill_20120806_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_976_bill_20120831_enrolled.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_976_vote_20110504_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_976_vote_20110518_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_976_vote_20110531_0101PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_976_vote_20120515_000003_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_976_vote_20120515_000004_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_976_vote_20120515_000005_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_976_vote_20120611_000006_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_976_vote_20120702_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_976_vote_20120822_1151AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_976_vote_20120827_0150PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback