CA AB973 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Sections 3016.5 and 3116.5 to the Elections Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Remote accessible vote by mail system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-15 - Assembly - AB 973 LOW Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # AB973 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 973 LOW Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-15 Vetoed by Governor.
2017-09-26AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2017-09-15AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 3497.).
2017-09-14AssemblyFrom Special Consent Calendar. Ordered to unfinished business file.
2017-09-14AssemblyOrdered to special consent calendar.
2017-09-14AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2017-09-14SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2908.).
2017-09-12SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2017-09-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
2017-08-21SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-19SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-14SenateReferred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2017-06-01SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1965.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-30AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 26).
2017-04-05AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-03-22AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on E. & R.
2017-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2017-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code3016.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Elections Code3116.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback